RUGBY HIGH SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity engages in a variety of fund raising activities and this allows us to fund all or part of the cost of additional activities and items for the benefit of the students at Rugby High School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 18 February 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vikas Garg | Chair | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Derya Bahceci | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Watson | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pallavi Subramanyam | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Marianne Juckes | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Louise Holland | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.21k | £3.22k | £4.93k | £3.89k | £5.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.02k | £1.32k | £3.42k | £5.86k | £1.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 July 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1992 AS AMENDED 19 SEPTEMBER 2000, 27 SEPTEMBER 2002 AND 1 OCTOBER 2009 AS AMENDED ON 08 DEC 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
RUGBY HIGH SCHOOL
LONGROOD ROAD
RUGBY
CV22 7RE
- Phone:
- 01788 810518
- Email:
- rhspta@rugbyhighschool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window