NEWBALD CHURCH ROOMS YOUNG PEOPLES PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a base for Children and Young People in Newbald and the surrounding area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,235 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 16 January 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEN TOWNEND | Chair | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
KAYTE WHYTE | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
EMMA HIBBS | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Clare de Luca | Trustee | 21 January 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.64k | £30.36k | £33.51k | £16.70k | £14.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.02k | £20.35k | £36.58k | £17.39k | £15.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.23k | £24.75k | £24.02k | £3.89k | £1.24k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 November 2020 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11 NOVEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED ON 7 JUNE 2004.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE OF NEWBALD FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IF THOSE FACILITIES ARE PROVIDED IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, WITH VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NEWBALD AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Eastgate
North Newbald
YORK
YO43 4SD
- Phone:
- 07852226761
- Email:
- Newbaldypp@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.