Accounts and annual returns THE ALTERNATIVE GROUP LIMITED

Charity Number: 1094477
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 28 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 19 December 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 25 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 25 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 15 February 2006 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 30 December 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 31 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 31 January 2005 On Time