RIVA RESIDENCIES IN VISUAL ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Riva will sponsor and organise teaching residencies of visual artists in various environments. The artists will work with specific groups and individuals on art projects. Riva will select visual artists whose professional experience, artistic subject matter and working methods are suitable to further Riva's aims.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout London
Governance
- 28 March 2003: Standard registration
- RIVA (Working name)
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
deborah ann clark law henocq | Chair | 01 February 2003 |
|
|
||||
ronald david henocq | Trustee | 24 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
MINNA STEVENS | Trustee | 01 February 2003 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.00k | £34.00k | £40.00k | £50.01k | £24.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.39k | £39.64k | £54.48k | £48.50k | £23.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 01 02 03
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN VISUAL ARTS INCLUDING PAINTING, SCULPTURE, PHOTOGRAPHY, FILM INSTALLATION AND PERFORMANCE ART, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS AND GRANTS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
72B Southgate Road
LONDON
N1 3JF
- Phone:
- 0207 254 2074
- Email:
- info@riva-artists.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window