Financial history SKILLFAST-UK LIMITED

Charity number: 1096764
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £3.14m £4.72m £4.54m £3.31m £4.27m
Total expenditure £2.92m £4.65m £4.72m £3.13m £3.39m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £39.11k £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £3.25m £4.21m
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £8.15k £58.95k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £12.07k £6.15k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £2.65m £3.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £55.24k £47.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £423.71k £337.19k