THE FRIENDS OF KIPLIN HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising to help Kiplin Hall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 24 October 2002: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Artemis Toouli | Chair | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
JULIA GREENWOOD | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Martin Greenwood | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margret Newton | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
DARINA MARIA OLIVER | Trustee | 15 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
JULIA EVELYN ATKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.73k | £6.74k | £7.26k | £7.34k | £6.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.98k | £3.73k | £6.52k | £6.08k | £12.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 15 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 21 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 16 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 18 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 SEPTEMBER 2002. as amended on 25 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF KIPLIN HALL (A CHARITABLE TRUST NO: 255163) THROUGH THE ACTIVITY OF A GROUP OF FRIENDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FRIENDS OF KIPLIN HALL
Kiplin HALL
RICHMOND
North Yorkshire
DL10 6AT
- Phone:
- 01748818178
- Email:
- friends@kiplinhall.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window