Trustees NORTHAMPTON TOWN FC COMMUNITY TRUST
Charity number: 1092502

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Scott Desborough | Chair | 18 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Mary Elizabeth Balchin-Love | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brandon William Ransley | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Peter Jones | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Mattock | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Terence John Hollowell | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John May | Trustee | 02 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Stephen Whiting | Trustee | 19 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANET ELAINE DEBOO | Trustee | 19 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY MICHAEL HANNING | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Croot | Trustee | 15 January 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.