THE OXFORDSHIRE BRANCH OF THE CAMPAIGN TO PROTECT RURAL ENGLAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to work for the improvement protection and preservation of the countryside of Oxfordshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £12,900 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 23 July 2002: Standard registration
- OXFORDSHIRE CPRE (Working name)
- THE OXFORDSHIRE BRANCH OF THE COUNCIL FOR THE PROTECTION OF RURAL ENGLAND (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Peterson Hallett | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Gillespie | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claudia Ginevra Lusardi | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Leonard Marsh | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susannah Elizabeth Mather | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Mary Field | Trustee | 19 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Dolden | Trustee | 19 June 2021 |
|
|||||
DORIAN GRIER | Trustee | 06 July 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.04k | £53.07k | £180.91k | £78.69k | £174.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.53k | £67.85k | £135.15k | £139.88k | £187.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £12.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 MAY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04 AUG 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE IMPROVEMENT AND PROTECTION OF THE ENGLISH COUNTRYSIDE AND IN PARTICULAR THAT OF OXFORDSHIRE AND ITS CITY, TOWNS AND VILLAGES AND THE BETTER DEVELOPMENT OF THE RURAL ENVIRONMENT.
Area of benefit
OXFORDSHIRE AND ITS CITY, TOWNS AND VILLAGES
Contact information
- Address:
-
CPRE Oxfordshire
20 High Street
WATLINGTON
Oxfordshire
OX49 5PY
- Phone:
- 01491612079
- Email:
- campaign@cpreoxon.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window