THE SIKH SCHOLARSHIP FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants for research and education related activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 October 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 December 2002: Standard registration
- 09 April 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- SSF (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/10/2010 | 30/10/2011 | 30/10/2012 | 30/10/2013 | 30/10/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.60k | £600 | £600 | £600 | £240 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 October 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2014 | 25 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2013 | 15 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25TH NOVEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
THE FUND SHALL BE VESTED IN AND HELD BY OR UNDER THE CONTROL OF THE TRUSTEES UPON TRUST (SUBJECT TO THE PAYMENT OF ALL EXPENSES PROPERLY INCURRED IN CONNECTION WITH THE SCHEME (EXCEPT EXPENSES INCURRED IN CONNECTION WITH THE ESTABLISHMENT OF THE SCHEME, WHICH SHALL BE MET BY THE FOUNDATION) TO APPLY THE INCOME AND THE CAPITAL OF THE FUND FOR: THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN SIKH RELIGION, CULTURE AND HISTORY IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH: (A) FUNDING BY SCHOLARSHIP, PRIZE, GRANT OR BURSARY ALL OR PART OR TO SUCH EXTENT AS DEEMED APPROPRIATE BY THE TRUSTEES, THE EDUCATION OF SIKHS ELIGIBLE TO PARTICIPATE IN THE SCHEME IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE RULES AND WHO ARE RECIPIENTS OF AN AWARD; AND (B) FUNDING BY GRANT ANY INDIVIDUAL, ORGANISATION OR COMPANY THAT UNDERTAKES RESEARCH, TEACHING OR CARRIES OUT PROJECTS IN RELATION TO THE PRESERVATION AND STUDY OF SIKH HISTORY, CULTURE AND RELIGION AND IS A RECIPIENT OF AN AWARD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window