THE GUILD OF PSYCHOTHERAPISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote through psychotherapy the relief of psychological disorders in members of the public, by education, training, research and by clinical procedure.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 September 2002: Standard registration
- 23 May 2019: Funds received from 267143 THE GUILD OF PSYCHOTHERAPISTS STUDENTSHIPS TRUST
- GUILD OF PSYCHOTHERAPISTS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benedict Paul Michael Tunstall | Chair | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sian Angharad Morgan | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mariana Dodig | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ivana Redfern | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Caroline Thomas | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Fassolas | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Michael Ridley | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frances Margaret Stedman | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nichola Koratjitis | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Myra Connell | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Willett | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Joy Yaron-Field | Trustee | 09 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Ruth Mitchinson | Trustee | 09 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
DENIS JEAN-BERNARD ECHARD | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £280.06k | £250.41k | £193.72k | £230.13k | £216.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £263.57k | £255.84k | £248.12k | £242.46k | £211.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 August 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 04 August 2023 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/05/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/04/2002 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29/04/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 JUL 2003 as amended on 14 May 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THROUGH PSYCHOTHERAPY OFFERED BY ITS MEMBERS, THE RELIEF OF PSYCHOLOGICAL DISTURBANCE OR DISORDER IN MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING FOR: A) EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN, AND THE UNDERTAKING OF RESEARCH CONNECTED WITH PSYCHOANALYTICAL PSYCHOTHERAPY FOR TRAINEES, STUDENTS, MEMBERS AND OTHER PRACTITIONERS OF PSYCHOTHERAPY, PROVIDED THAT SUCH EDUCATION, TRAINING AND RESEARCH SHALL COVER AS WIDE A RANGE OF THEORIES WITHIN THE PSYCHOLSLYTICAL AND PSYCHODYNAMIC MODELS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE PRACTICABLE AND PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT: (I) NO ONE OR MORE THEORIES WITHIN THE SAID MODELS SHALL BE DEEMED MORE AUTHORITATIVE THAN ANY OTHER SUCH THEORY OR THEORIES; (II)NO MEMBER, TRAINEE OR STUDENT SHALL BE REQUIRED AT ANY TIME TO PRACTICE PSCHOANANLYTICAL PSYCHOTHERAPY SOLEY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRICINPLES OF ANY ONE OR MORE THEORY OR THEORIES WITHIN THE SAID MODELS TO THE EXCLUSION OF ANY OTHER SUCH THEORY OR THEORIES; AND (B) TO PROVIDE (SUBJECT TO CRITERIA ESTABLISHED UNDER THE DIRECTION OF THE COUNCIL) PSYCHOTHERAPY TO INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE UNABLE TO AFFORD COMMERCIAL MARKET RATES AND FOR WHOM THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE IS UNABLE TO OFFER SUCH PROVISION ON A TIMELY BASIS WHERE THE CHARGE TO THE INDIVIDUAL IS LESS THAN SUCH CURRENT COMMERCIAL MARKET RATES. SUCH OTHER ACTIVITIES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE CONSISTENT WITH THE PROVISIONS O PARAGRAPH 3(A) AND 3(B) HEREOF INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE ORGANISATION AND RUNNING OF ANY INSTITUTION THAT MAY BE DEEMED NECESSARY TO CARRY OUT THE OBJECTIVES HEREIN SET OUT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE GUILD OF PSYCHOTHERAPISTS
47 NELSON SQUARE
LONDON
SE1 0QA
- Phone:
- 07833746569
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window