ST MARY'S (BRAMALL LANE) COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides services to disadvantaged people in the Sharrow and surrounding areas of Sheffield. Particular focus on working with people from ethnic minorities, children and young people and the elderly. Creating community resilience by running a Time Bank and Community Cafe.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £8,884 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 16 October 2002: Standard registration
- ST MARY'S (BRAMHALL LANE) COMMUNITY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev CLAIRE LOUISE DAWSON | Chair | 24 April 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Andrew Robert Cribb | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|||||||||
George Wayne Rees | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Miriam Cavanagh | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Elizabeth Ann Brownhill | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|||||||||
John Rick | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £380.57k | £630.10k | £373.26k | £356.47k | £482.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £341.26k | £419.92k | £343.85k | £438.41k | £501.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £71.77k | £10.60k | £9.23k | £8.88k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £492.52k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £79.89k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £57.38k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £307 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £419.92k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £7.27k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD, AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE INHABITANTS LIVING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISHES IN THE CITY AND DIOCESE OF SHEFFIELD ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY BRINGING TOGETHER THE STATUTORY, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO: 3.1.1 RELIEVE POVERTY 3.1.2 ADVANCE EDUCATION (INCLUDING RELIGIOUS, MORAL AND PHYSICAL EDUCATION) 3.1.3 PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND FOR LEISURE AND SPARE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS 3.2 TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE A CENTRE ("THE CENTRE") FOR THE ACTIVITIES OF THE CHARITY REQUIRED TO ACHIEVE THE OBJECTS AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE ACTIVITIES WHICH CONFORM CLOSEST TO THE OBJECTS AS SPECIFIED IN THE INSTRUMENTS OF DELEGATION DATED 19TH OCTOBER 1956 AND 1ST JULY 1982 ("THE ORIGINAL GOVERNING DOCUMENTS") 3.3 TO COLLECT, MAINTAIN AND ADMINISTER FUNDS FOR ALL OR ANY OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
CITY OF SHEFFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARYS COMMUNITY CENTRE
BRAMALL LANE
SHEFFIELD
S2 4QZ
- Phone:
- 01142230223
- Email:
- admin@stmarys-church.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window