EUROPEAN SUZUKI TEACHING DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support teacher training courses for Suzuki teachers for which we pay the costs of the teacher trainer. In 2021-22 we have potential projects in South Africa and Zimbabwe (if security allows), and in Poland, Spain and online for Ukrainian teachers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Austria
- Belgium
- Croatia
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Estonia
- Faroe Islands
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Hungary
- Iceland
- Ireland
- Italy
- Latvia
- Lithuania
- Netherlands
- Norway
- Poland
- Russia
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Turkey
- Ukraine
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 10 July 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr HAUKUR FLOSI HANNESSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
BIRTE KELLY | Trustee | 30 November 2024 |
|
|||||
HANNAH O'DELL | Trustee | 30 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Juan Drown | Trustee | 30 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN RUETTIMAN | Trustee | 26 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE MAGASINER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.77k | £72.25k | £16.13k | £8.88k | £8.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.68k | £9.59k | £21.20k | £10.66k | £17.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON THE 15TH MARCH 2002. as amended on 30 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC PARTICULARLY CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, ABOUT ALL ASPECTS OF THE TEACHING METHODS, PHILOSOPHY AND PRACTICES OF DR SHINICHI SUZUKI IN EUROPE AND ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Mr. Juan Drown
21 Viceroy Close
East End Road
London N2 8BA
N2 8BA
- Phone:
- 07594222551
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window