Financial history ENVIRONMENTAL VISION

Charity Number: 1095328
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £798.06k £744.45k £884.94k £1.08m £1.25m
Total expenditure £738.14k £666.90k £857.56k £1.06m £1.26m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £15.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £50.49k £79.95k £192.54k £173.96k £433.31k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £16.51k
Income - Charitable activities £747.57k £656.74k £692.40k £904.61k £795.31k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £7.76k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £650.69k £601.28k £762.11k £951.38k £1.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds £87.45k £65.63k £95.45k £107.00k £122.28k
Expenditure - Governance £12.49k £12.27k £11.83k £13.20k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0