COPTIC MEDICAL SOCIETY UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To establish palliative care in Egypt for cancer patients. 2. To train visiting doctors and nurses for pain relief in Egypt for terminal cancer. 3. To help in the treatment of patients to relieve disease and illness. 4. To relieve people in-need by providing financial support. 5. To advance education by providing training and/or financial support for doctors, detists, pharmacists and nurse.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Solihull
- Egypt
Governance
- 09 September 2004: Standard registration
- COPTIC MEDICAL SOCIETY (UK) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr KAMEL MAKRAM SHAROBEEM | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr MARIA DIMITRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHENOUDA GORGUI SHALABY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr MICHAEL SALIB GEORGY MBBCHFRCOG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ESSAM SHOKRY DIMITRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR FAYEK NAGUIB YOUSSEF | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr RAAFAT GADELRAB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr NABIL RAPHAEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr MAGDY MICHEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR MARY SALAMA MB, BSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NABIL AZIZ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr CLAIRE RAPHAEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £209.82k | £159.67k | £211.95k | £130.47k | £129.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £165.26k | £140.17k | £195.93k | £169.74k | £211.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31 JULY 2004
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE PEOPLE IN NEED BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT 2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING TRAINING AND/OR FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR DOCTORS, DENTISTS, PHARMACISTS AND NURSES WORKING OVERSEAS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 NORTH PARK
LONDON
SE9 5AP
- Phone:
- 02082651047
- Email:
- nabilraphael@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window