Financial history THE SHIRLEY PUGH FOUNDATION FOR THE WELFARE OF ANIMALS

Charity number: 1095653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £24.27k £19.96k £22.62k £23.91k £22.02k
Total expenditure £26.89k £26.46k £13.74k £29.41k £17.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A