THE SHIRLEY PUGH FOUNDATION FOR THE WELFARE OF ANIMALS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS AND TO PROTECT THE ENVIRONMENT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 January 2003: Standard registration
- THE SHIRLEY PUGH FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Pugh | Trustee | 08 January 2003 |
|
|||||
ROBERT PATRICK JAMES PUGH | Trustee | 08 January 2003 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.27k | £19.96k | £22.62k | £23.91k | £22.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.89k | £26.46k | £13.74k | £29.41k | £17.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 JANUARY 2003.
Charitable objects
PREVENTING OR RELIEVING THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS AND FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROTECTING THEIR ENVIRONMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat One
No.2 Montpellier Spa Road
Cheltenham
Gloucestershire
GL50 1UL
- Phone:
- 01242221238
- Email:
- pughmj@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window