Accounts and annual returns SHEPLEY WOMENS INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1092598
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | 22 October 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 29 August 2008 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2006 | 08 February 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2005 | 11 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2004 | 16 November 2005 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2004 | 10 November 2004 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window