Financial history SHEPLEY WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1092598
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2004 31/10/2005 31/10/2006 31/08/2007 31/08/2008
Total gross income £1.59k £2.09k £2.69k £3.32k £2.32k
Total expenditure £1.61k £2.13k £2.55k £3.27k £2.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A