STONEWALL EQUALITY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting equality and human rights for lesbian, gay, bisexual and trans people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£6,915,904
Donations and legacies | £1.44m | |
Charitable activities | £5.27m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £8.16k | |
Other | £197.01k |
Total expenditure:
£7,774,365
Raising funds | £1.60m | |
Charitable activities | £6.18m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £183,445 from 203 government contract(s) and £618,757 from 8 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.60m | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.18m |
People

114 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 4 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 December 2003: Standard registration
- THE STONEWALL LOBBY GROUP LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Dixon | Chair | 25 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kushal Bipinchandra Khandhar | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Dickinson-Lilley | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sadiq Gillani | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tayibatu Alao | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gbolahan Faleye | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ayla Zoe Louise HOLDOM | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.32m | £11.55m | £7.85m | £7.78m | £6.92m | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.12m | £12.77m | £8.22m | £8.22m | £7.77m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £380.46k | £183.45k | |
|
Income from government grants | £702.30k | £1.87m | £426.39k | £527.87k | £618.76k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.74m | £2.33m | £1.85m | £1.82m | £1.44m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.12m | £0 | £364.20k | £365.85k | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £5.41m | £9.21m | £5.63m | £5.59m | £5.27m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £46.10k | £14.97k | £1.29k | £2.80k | £8.16k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £197.01k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £377.75k | £425.41k | £208.96k | £170.37k | £447 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £7.50m | £10.83m | £6.71m | £6.49m | £6.18m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.62m | £1.94m | £1.52m | £1.72m | £1.60m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £58.36k | £58.00k | £112.71k | £133.09k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £270.56k | £216.63k | £403.66k | £284.37k | £183.82k | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.09m | £1.10m | £1.10m | £1.10m | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £3.61m | £3.24m | £2.41m | £1.92m | £2.00m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £932.97k | £1.75m | £1.48m | £1.31m | £1.19m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/08/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/09/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/04/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16/03/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 FEB 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS (A) MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS (B) RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSES (C) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT HUMAN RIGHTS (D) PROVIDING ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS (E) CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW (F) COMMENTING ON PROPOSED HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION (G) RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES (H) PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS (I) PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS (J) INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS (K) ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT, BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDE THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIES OUT ITS OBJECTS. TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PARTICULAR THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUND OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY; A) RAISING AWARENESS OF ALL ASPECTS OF DISCRIMINATION IN SOCIETY BY PUBLICATIONS, LECTURES, USE OF THE MEDIA, PUBLIC ADVOCACY AND OTHER MEANS OF COMMUNICATION; B) CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS OF THE SAME TO THE PUBLIC; C) ADVANCING EDUCATION IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY WHETHER BY TEACHING OR PRODUCING MATERIALS; D) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY BY THE USE OF PUBLICATIONS, CODES OF PRACTICE, SCHEMES FOR EMPLOYERS, AWARD SCHEMES, THE MEDIA AND PUBLIC ADVOCACY; E) PROMOTING THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF THE LAW RELATING TO EQUALITY ISSUES BY; I) THE PROVISION OF SPECIALIST LEGAL ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND REPRESENTATION TO PEOPLE WHO ARE UNABLE TO OBTAIN SUCH LEGAL ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND REPRESENTATION AS A RESULT OF THEIR LACK OF RESOURCE; II) THE PROVISION OF SPECIALIST LEGAL INTERVENTION TO ASSIST THE COURTS; AND III) THE PROVISION OF ADVICE ON THE INSTITUTIONS, STRUCTURES AND MECHANISMS BY WHICH SUCH LAW IS ENFORCED; TO RELIEVE POVERTY; AND TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER PURPOSE WHICH IS CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stonewall
188-192 St. John Street
LONDON
EC1V 4JY
- Phone:
- 02075931850
- Email:
- info@stonewall.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window