THE COT DEATH SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 June 2002: Standard registration
- 20 April 2006: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 20 April 2006: Funds transferred to 262191 THE LULLABY TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2004 | 31/01/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £58.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.58k | £81.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2005 | 30 August 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2005 | 31 January 2006 | 62 days late | |
Annual return | 31 January 2004 | 04 January 2005 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2004 | 04 January 2005 | 35 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 DECEMBER 2000, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13 APRIL 2002
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF BABIES DEEMED TO BE AT RISK FROM COT DEATH ; IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF RESPIRATION MONITORS; TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF FAMILIES OF COT DEATH VICTIMS BY PROVIDING COUNSELLING AND ADVICE.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window