Financial history KENNINGHALL LANDS TRUST

Charity number: 1096221
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.16k £113 £2.51k £3.74k £3.74k
Total expenditure £719 £232 £4.49k £620 £621
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A