EAST AREA ASYLUM SEEKERS SUPPORT GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The East Area Asylum Seekers Support Group is a local charity based in Newcastle upon Tyne. We support destitute asylum seekers in the area. Trustees are in the process of closing the charity as we are now no longer operating in any capacity with clients. We have completed our annual accounts, closed the bank account and will take steps to close imminently.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 July 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 05 January 2004: Standard registration
- 05 June 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
- E.A.A.S.S.G. (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 30/07/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.76k | £4.51k | £5.01k | £3.14k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.31k | £15.90k | £6.36k | £3.46k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 July 2017 | 29 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 24 January 2018 | 358 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 24 January 2018 | 724 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/01/2003 AS AMENDED ON 08/09/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RELIEF FOR ASYLUM SEEKERS AND REFUGEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS PRIMARILY IN THE EAST AREA OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUCH ASYLUM SEEKERS, REFUGEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF LOCAL PEOPLE AND THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF ASYLUM SEEKERS AND REFUGEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN ORDER TO ASSIST THEIR INCLUSION INTO THE WIDER COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
PRIMARY AREA OF BENEFIT MEANS THE EAST AREA OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE & THE SURROUNDING AREA AS DEFINED BY THE FIVE LOCAL AUTHORITY WARDS OF OUSEBURN, SOUTH HEATON, WALKERGATE, WALKER AND BYKER.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window