YEMENI DAY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides a drop in service and day opportunities which aims to deliver welfare and support services to all older people especially those who are frail or disabled and adult carers, particularly targeting less visible BME whose first language is Arabic in Birmingham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 27 January 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NOWRAH ABDUL | Chair | 19 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Leyanna Kaid | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Khadija Zaid | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
FASAL KAID | Trustee | 19 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMED FARAH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £202 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £604 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2022 | 352 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 APRIL 2002 AS AMENDED 18 JULY 2002.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF YEMENI PEOPLE DISADVANTAGED BY REASON OF INFIRMITY, DISABLEMENT, POVERTY AND SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES, RESIDENT IN SOUTH BIRMINGHAM IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS;
Area of benefit
SOUTH BIRMINGHAM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O 17 Court Road
Balsall Heath
Birmingham
B12 9LQ
- Phone:
- 01214465276
- Email:
- yemenidaycentre@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window