Accounts and annual returns THE MERSEA ISLAND FESTIVAL TRUST

Charity number: 1097455
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 20 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 20 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 27 June 2024 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 27 June 2024 143 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 13 February 2022 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 25 June 2021 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 25 June 2021 140 days late Download Open in new window