THE MERSEA ISLAND FESTIVAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust supports two annual camps on Mersea Island, Essex that bring together over 400 young people and adults with or without a physical or learning disability. Participants are challenged and stimulated as they gain confidence, self esteem and new friends whilst experiencing a wide range of fun and exciting activities, supported by a team of over 70 volunteers of all ages and abilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
69 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 09 May 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Brennan | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rosemarie Elizabeth Saunders | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ewen Stewart Wilson | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paula Moore | Trustee | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA DAYTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.70k | £3.38k | £4.02k | £33.55k | £93.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £110.53k | £1.20k | £396 | £39.65k | £101.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 27 June 2024 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 27 June 2024 | 143 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 13 February 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 25 June 2021 | 140 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 25 June 2021 | 140 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 8 MARCH 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10 APRIL 2003
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT AND EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE (UP TO THE AGE OF 25) AND ADULTS WITH DISABILITIES, BY THE PROMOTION OF ACTIVITIES SO THAT THEY MAY DEVELOP THEIR MENTAL , PHYSICAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES AND ACHIEVE GREATER MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 Firs Chase
West Mersea
Colchester
CO5 8NG
- Phone:
- 07515 945803
- Email:
- info@merseafestival.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window