THE FRIENDS OF ST BARNABAS CHURCH, ALPHAMSTONE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising for the restoration and maintenance of St.Barnabs' Church,Alphamstone,including it's goods and chattels and churchyard.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 04 September 2002: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES VICTOR DINWIDDY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
HARRY MATTHEW FAULL | Trustee | 30 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
GRANIA ANNE NELSON | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Desmond Robert Bridge | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Mary Twinn | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN ARMSTRONG HUGGINS | Trustee | 01 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
mark maley | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.58k | £5.37k | £6.41k | £5.82k | £6.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.47k | £4.21k | £3.85k | £3.77k | £4.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 January 2021 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 February 2021 | 111 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JUNE 2002
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE, BY CONTRIBUTION, TO MAINTAIN, REPAIR, RESTORE, IMPROVE AND RECONSTRUCT THE FABRIC OF ST. BARNABAS CHURCH, ALPHAMSTONE, INCLUDING ITS MONUMENTS, FIXTURES, FITTINGS, FURNITURE, STAINED GLASS, ORNAMENTS, OTHER CHATTELS AND ITS CHURCHYARD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
ESSEX - CHELMSFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Roycroft House
Goulds Road
Alphamstone
Bures
CO8 5HW
- Phone:
- 01787269077
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window