MATERNITY WORLDWIDE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 24 September 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 September 2002: Standard registration
- 08 April 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 08 April 2009: Funds transferred to 1111504 MATERNITY WORLDWIDE LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 24/09/2004 | 24/09/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.85k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.65k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 24 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 24 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 24 September 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 24 September 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 24 September 2006 | 07 March 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 September 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 September 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 24 September 2005 | 23 May 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 24 September 2004 | 13 September 2005 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 September 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 MARCH 2002 AND AS AMENDED ON 16 SEPTEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
1. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE HEALTH OF WOMEN UNDERGOING CHILDBIRTH, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF DOCTORS, MIDWIVES AND OTHER PERSONNEL TO WORK IN MATERNITY UNITS IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE UNDERTAKING AND DISSEMINATION OF RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL & OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window