LAMPETER CHRISTIAN CENTRE CANOLFAN GRISTNOGOL LLANBED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian faith and the promotion of any other charitable purpose for the benefit of the community of Mid and West Wales by the advancement of education, the protection of health and relief of poverty and sickness as an expression of the Christian faith. The Lampeter Christian Centre comprises of a coffee shop, a Christian bookstall and other materials and a meeting room whe
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Carmarthenshire
- Ceredigion
Governance
- 06 August 2002: Standard registration
- YR HEDYN MWSTARD / THE MUSTARD SEED (Working name)
- YR HEDYN MWSTARD THE MUSTARD SEED (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR GARETH JONES | Chair | 13 September 2011 |
|
|||||
Tony Hayward | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Eleri Roderick | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Reeves | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MARY JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Catrin Menna Jones | Trustee |
|
||||||
THOMAS IEUAN DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.47k | £100.90k | £111.68k | £147.73k | £163.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £108.91k | £82.94k | £107.77k | £156.19k | £177.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £56.52k | £10.18k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 JUNE 2002
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF DOCTRINES IN THE SCHEDULE, AND IN PARTICULAR, BY THE PROVISION OF CHRISTIAN LITERATURE IN VARIOUS MEDIA. B) THE PROMOTION OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF MID AND WEST WALES BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AS AN EXPRESSION OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Area of benefit
MID AND WEST WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
COED Y MWSTWR
NORTH ROAD
LAMPETER
SA48 7JA
- Phone:
- 01570423368
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window