SOMALI SENIOR CITIZENS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Day time lunch served six days a week, Monday to Saturday between 9.30 am to 4 pm Providing advice and information on social welfare services, networking with Tower Hamlet's law center, Housing Department and citizen's advice bureau. Health advice and interpretation services. Provide facilities for social activities and religious studies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £27,292 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 14 May 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMA OMAR | Chair | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMUD ABDI HUSSEIN | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hussein M Farah | Trustee | 12 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Suleiman Araleh | Trustee | 12 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMED ADAN GULAID | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.24k | £145.11k | £51.32k | £72.53k | £57.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.18k | £111.24k | £82.34k | £71.85k | £72.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £20.31k | N/A | £15.76k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £32.52k | £124.80k | £37.16k | £23.25k | £27.29k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 JANUARY 2002 AS AMENDED 20 MARCH 2003
Charitable objects
THE ORGANISATION IS ESTABLISHED FOR ELDERLY PERSONS, PARTICULARLY SOMALIANS, LIVING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS TO ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
ELDERLY PERSONS PARTICULARLY SOMALIANS LIVING IN LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Somali Senior Citizens Club
37 St. Matthew's Row
LONDON
E2 6DT
- Phone:
- 07949244941
- Email:
- sscclub1@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window