Accounts and annual returns BETTER LIFE ASSEMBLY BIBLEWAY CHURCH

Charity number: 1095131
Charity reporting is overdue by 36 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 36 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 36 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 14 November 2024 228 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 14 November 2024 228 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 10 October 2023 193 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 10 October 2023 193 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 09 January 2023 284 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 09 January 2023 284 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 20 May 2021 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 20 May 2021 50 days late Download Open in new window