UNITED HOMEWORK CLUB AND CULTURAL DEVELOPMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public, particularly children through homework club after school. Helping pupils from ethnic minority background in order to achieve better grades in schools. To promote inclusive society and community cohesion through education and social events. Filling online forms such as: Universal Credit, Benefit, Housing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bolton
- Manchester City
Governance
- 06 January 2003: Standard registration
- U.H.C.A.C.D. (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HUSSEIN ALAS | Chair |
|
||||||
Abiy Gesesse Haile | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Olow Odowa | Trustee | 04 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
IBRAHIM ABDI MUHUMED | Trustee | 04 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMED HAFFOW IBRAHIM | Trustee | 04 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
ABDULLAHI OSMAN MOHAMED | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.70k | £2.59k | £3.01k | £1.78k | £1.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.03k | £600 | £896 | £1.25k | £900 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 JUNE 2001 AS AMENDED 30 NOVEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR, BY: A) SETTING UP A HOMEWORK CLUB IN BOLTON 3DS (DEANE/DERBY/DAUBHILL) FOR SCHOOL CHILDREN AFTER THE SCHOOL TIME AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS. (INCLUSIVE ALL SUBJECTS) B) HELPING PUPILS FROM ETHNIC MINORITY BACKGROUND TOP PERFORM WELL IN SCHOOLS. C) VISITING AND SUPPORTING FAMILIES WITH SCHOOL CHILDREN OF AGE BETWEEN 5 TO 16, IN ORDER TO MONITOR AND HELP THE CHILDREN'S STUDY PROGRESS. D) ENCOURAGING CHILDREN TO DEVELOP GOOD BEHAVIOUR, UNDERSTANDING AND SOCIALISE (GOOD CITIZENSHIP, RESPECT AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING) AMONG THE CHILDREN AND THEIR NEIGHBOURHOOD. E) PROMOTING CHILDREN'S INTEREST AND THEIR MULTICULTURAL BACKGROUNDS. F) SETTING UP ADULT CLASSES IN ENGLISH FOR SPEAKERS OF OTHER LANGUAGES (ESOL) AND IT TRAINING. 2. TO RELIEVE REFUGEES AND THEIR FAMILIES BY THE PROVISION OF ASSISTED INFORMATION AND OTHER CHARITABLE FORMS OF SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
IN BOLTON 3DS (DEANE/DERBY/DAUBHILL)
Contact information
- Address:
-
WORLDWIDE LINK
224 DEANE ROAD
BOLTON
BL3 5DP
- Phone:
- 07903589398
- Email:
- HKOOKE62@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window