THE MULTIPLE BIRTHS FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assistance and support of multiple birth families by working with healthcare and other professionals to raise awareness of their special needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 November 2002: Standard registration
- 13 January 2025: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £141.49k | £50.30k | £32.91k | £121.66k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.27k | £79.42k | £84.46k | £224.06k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 July 2024 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 April 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 29TH APRIL 2002 AND AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 4TH OCTOBER 2002
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC INCLUDING PERSONS ENGAGED IN MEDICAL, EDUCATIONAL OR WELFARE PROFESSIONS, ABOUT THE INCIDENCE AND EFFECTS OF MULTIPLE BIRTHS AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION ABOUT ALL ASPECTS OF THE CARE, WELFARE AND DEVELOPMENT OF TWINS AND HIGHER MULTIPLES; AND B) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH AND PROMOTE THE GENERAL WELFARE OF TWINS AND HIGHER MULTIPLES, INCLUDING THOSE WITH SPECIAL NEEDS; AND C) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH (BOTH PHYSICAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL) OF THE PARENTS AND TWINS OR HIGHER MULTIPLES, WITH SPECIAL REGARD TO THE HEALTH OF WOMEN WHO ARE EXPECTING MULTIPLE BIRTHS OR WHO HAVE GIVEN BIRTH TO TWINS OR HIGHER MULTIPLES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window