Financial history CEDARS PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1092899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £66.62k £28.91k £33.09k £43.26k £39.01k
Total expenditure £69.36k £31.57k £44.32k £31.23k £33.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A