CEDARS PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity Number: 1092899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To manage monies payed for residential school trips, in-school events and fundraising activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £39,011
Total expenditure: £33,666

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Milton Keynes

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 July 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CEDARS COMBINED SCHOOL (Working name)
  • CEDARS COMBINED (NEWPORT PAGNELL) SCHOOL FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanne Goldsmith Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Kate Warren Trustee 14 October 2019
None on record
LOUISA Swannell Trustee 21 March 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £66.62k £28.91k £33.09k £43.26k £39.01k
Total expenditure £69.36k £31.57k £44.32k £31.23k £33.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 20 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 20 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 04 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 04 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 16 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 16 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 03 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 03 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 17 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Cedars Primary School
Bury Street
NEWPORT PAGNELL
MK16 0DT
Phone:
01908610561