BONGOBIR OSMANY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cultural and Social Events Educational Programmes Training and Development Promoting Community Cohesion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £6,900 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Camden
- Hackney
- Newham
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 17 February 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABUL KASHEM KHAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
KOYSOR ABDUL FOYEZ | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ABDUR RAHIM | Trustee | 31 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED AKLAKUR RAHMAN | Trustee | 28 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
FATEMA JOHURA KHAN | Trustee | 21 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.40k | £7.10k | £23.00k | £38.36k | £10.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.12k | £2.65k | £22.36k | £36.67k | £13.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £19.00k | £33.35k | £6.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 February 2022 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 February 2021 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 February 2021 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED DATED 11 JANUARY 2004.
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BENGALI CULTURE AND TRADITIONS AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE LIFE AND ACHIEVEMENTS OF GENERAL BONGOBIR OSMANY. 2. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. 3. THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
MR A K KHAN
UNIT 5, LINKS YARD
29A SPELLMAN STREET
LONDON
E1 5LX
- Phone:
- 02081270407
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window