Accounts and annual returns MARKHAM COMMUNITY HOUSE

Charity number: 1093646
Charity reporting is up to date (25 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 25 February 2025 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 25 February 2025 25 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 September 2024 216 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 03 September 2024 216 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 March 2022 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 March 2022 51 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window