GATESHEAD HARRIERS AND ATHLETIC CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Athletics Club
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 27 September 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gordon Bell | Chair | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Aileen Waite | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Gilmour | Trustee | 19 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANICE KAUFMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY GARDNER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.89k | £18.27k | £52.00k | £47.12k | £35.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.54k | £10.04k | £47.00k | £48.99k | £39.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.98k | £750 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 2 MAY 2002 AS AMENDED 1 OCTOBER 2009.
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ATHLETICS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gateshead International Stadium
Neilson Road
Gateshead
NE10 0EF
- Phone:
- 07776162345
- Email:
- janicekaufman28@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window