THE FRIENDS OF BORDEN CHURCH

Charity Number: 1094542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Coffee Morning, Fish & Chip Supper, Wine and Wisdom, Choir & Organ Recital, Wine Tasting, Music Concert. Strawberry Tea, Village Fete, Barn Dance, Race Night

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £9,330
Total expenditure: £13,514

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 November 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kathy Collins Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
Val Skinner Trustee 19 April 2015
BORDEN PARISH HALL
Received: On time
Daniel Skinner Trustee 06 April 2014
None on record
JUDGE ROBERT HARDY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.95k £2.17k £4.28k £11.57k £9.33k
Total expenditure £4.68k £1.57k £6.26k £1.78k £13.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 November 2023 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 December 2021 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CHURCH HILL HOUSE
SCHOOL LANE
BORDEN
SITTINGBOURNE
ME9 8JS
Phone:
01795420422