Sand Dams Worldwide Limited

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sand Dams Worldwide supports rural dryland communities to work their way out of poverty with dignity. Working with local partners, we support rural communities to gain access to clean water close to their homes and to invest in climate-smart agriculture. In pioneering sand dams we promote and support the application of sand dam technology by key stakeholders in drylands.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,439,910
Donations and legacies | £1.37m | |
Charitable activities | £73.37k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,391,413
Raising funds | £242.04k | |
Charitable activities | £1.15m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £242.04k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.15m | |
Retained for future use | £48.50k |
People

7 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Ethiopia
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Mozambique
- Tanzania
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 04 November 2002: Standard registration
- EXCELLENT (Working name)
- EXCELLENT DEVELOPMENT (Working name)
- EXCELLENT DEVELOPMENT LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Robert Jordan | Chair | 28 May 2015 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Sanjay Rao | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Leon Slowe | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Miguel Veiga-Pestana | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Halinishi Ndunge Yusuf | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Heloise Field | Trustee | 05 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Day | Trustee | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Busby | Trustee | 24 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARK MURPHY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.11m | £904.09k | £1.20m | £1.18m | £1.44m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.15m | £805.33k | £991.04k | £1.37m | £1.39m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £37.27k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.06m | £904.09k | £1.20m | £1.10m | £1.37m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £59.13k | £0 | £0 | £79.76k | £73.37k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £9.46k | £48.27k | £0 | £32.02k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £911.08k | £638.02k | £811.57k | £1.19m | £1.15m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £236.09k | £167.32k | £179.47k | £187.07k | £242.04k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £43.14k | £32.25k | £28.79k | £35.63k | £41.21k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £580.91k | £430.00k | £606.99k | £898.46k | £809.30k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.91k | £3.01k | £1.49k | £2.21k | £1.98k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £711.15k | £791.64k | £1.01m | £790.09k | £851.32k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £60.17k | £42.02k | £51.03k | £27.56k | £39.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 7TH MAY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26 OCTOBER 2002. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 MAY 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 AUG 2016 as amended on 14 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE:- 1. TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT, AND 2. TO RELIEVE POVERTY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY SUPPORTING SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT PROJECTS AND 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECTS OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT, CONSERVATION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE UNDERTAKING AND DISSEMINATION OF RESEARCH. (PLEASE SEE COPY OF THE SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON FILE FOR DETAILS).
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sand Dams Worldwide
7-14 Great Dover Street
London
SE1 4YR
- Phone:
- 020 3096 7861
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window