CHAVERIM YOUTH ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is established to promote the advancement of education, and in particular amongst the Jewish children under the age of eighteen in the United Kingdom so as to: Provide curricula and supplementary education programmes for young people; Provide vocational educational support to young people; Provide a range of recreational, social, sporting and artistic programmes for young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 April 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bezalel Solomon | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
ABRAHAM ALBERT BENDAHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RABBI MICHAEL BIBERFELD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £139.97k | £76.52k | £196.84k | £142.01k | £216.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £144.07k | £64.73k | £172.14k | £168.69k | £217.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 November 2020 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 November 2020 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED 21 FEBRUARY 2003
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, PARTICULAR AMONGST JEWISH CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF EIGHTEEN, ("THE OBJECTS") IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PARTICULAR GREATER LONDON AND MANCHESTER ("THE AREAS OF BENEFITS)] SO AS: 1) TO PROVIDE CURRICULA AND SUPPLEMENTARY EDUCATION PROGRAMMES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE; 2) TO PROVIDE VOCATIONAL EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT TO YOUNG PEOPLE 3) TO PROVIDE A RANGE OF RECREATIONAL, SOCIAL, SPORTING AND ARTISTIC PROGRAMMES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
LONDON, MANCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
2a Highfield Avenue
LONDON
NW11 9ET
- Phone:
- 02088024782
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window