SPORT IN DESFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of community participation within the village of Desford and its environs in healthy recreation, in particular by the provision of facilities for playing bowls, tennis, squash, football, recreational fitness, running and Scouting
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £17,002 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 27 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUE HOUGHTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nicholas Alder | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm David Hill | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
DALE MORTIMER | Trustee | 27 May 2013 |
|
|||||
MARTIN HAND | Trustee | 27 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN VIVIAN MORRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JIM HOUGHTON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87.79k | £88.61k | £81.15k | £114.73k | £69.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.11k | £38.27k | £85.62k | £120.38k | £70.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £3.50k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.39k | £49.63k | £3.50k | £6.59k | £17.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 April 2021 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 MARCH 2002
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION WITHIN THE VILLAGE OF DESFORD AND ITS ENVIRONS IN HEALTHY RECREATION, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING BOWLS, TENNIS, SQUASH, FOOTBALL, RECREATIONAL FITNESS AND RUNNING.
Area of benefit
VILLAGE OF DESFORD AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 BEDFORD CLOSE
DESFORD
LEICESTER
LE9 9HN
- Phone:
- 01455828786
- Email:
- suemh20@msn.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window