Accounts and annual returns ASTOR OF HEVER COMMUNITY SCHOOL PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1092831
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2007 10 July 2008 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 Not Required