ASTOR OF HEVER COMMUNITY SCHOOL PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
various fund raising events, quiz nights and fayres.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 05 July 2002: Standard registration
- 12 April 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2004 | 31/08/2005 | 31/08/2006 | 31/08/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.82k | £2.04k | £3.17k | £1.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.24k | £1.50k | £992 | £1.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 10 July 2008 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 MAY 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE ASTOR OF HEVER COMMUNITY SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window