Accounts and annual returns Merry Men Youth Sport Partnership

Charity number: 1098061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 03 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 02 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 17 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required