BAGLAN COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BCC was founded in April 02. In the year ending 5th April 2018 the membership was 95. Sunday morning services see around 200 people in attendance, there are approximately 50 at Sunday evening services. BCC owns The Centre at Lodge Drive, Baglan.The church has contact with local schools and The Centre and Coffee House are now used by the church, groups and clubs from the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 05 August 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr James Martyn Vile | Trustee | 10 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Andrew Buckley | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW GEORGE WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £181.32k | £103.83k | £129.77k | £145.96k | £160.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £194.42k | £117.99k | £132.20k | £148.01k | £169.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 JUNE 2002 AS AMENDED 6 JULY 2002 AS AMENDED 25 JANUARY 2004 AS AMENDED 26 APRIL 2009.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Stonechat Close
Nottage
PORTHCAWL
Mid Glamorgan
CF36 3QF
- Phone:
- 07825215234
- Email:
- thecentrebaglan@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window