ST PETER'S STAPENHILL CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1093235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the Christian religion in the charity's immeadiate operational area.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £3,814
Total expenditure: £12,929

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 July 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Melissa Wright Chair 23 January 2024
None on record
ELAINE DICKINSON Trustee
None on record
HAMISH IAN METHVEN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £6.92k £5.79k £5.92k £6.02k £3.81k
Total expenditure £0 £2.23k £706 £0 £12.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 04 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 02 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
100 Galloway Road
Drakelow
BURTON-ON-TRENT
DE15 9UJ
Phone:
07974433419
Website:

No information available