Financial history SOUTH RIBBLE PENSIONERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1093855
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.86k £505 £2.50k £5.74k £8.66k
Total expenditure £4.44k £2.06k £3.23k £3.48k £4.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A