SCHRODERS EMPLOYEE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty amongst employees and former employees of Schroders plc and their dependants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 April 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Holden | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM STAPLES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER GOODCHILD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £65 | £80 | |
|
Total expenditure | £60 | £69 | £5.16k | £5.09k | £3.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 15 February 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 15 July 2021 | 160 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 8 OCTOBER 2002
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST EMPLOYEES AND FORMER EMPLOYEES FOR THE TIME BEING AND FROM TIME TO TIME OF SCHRODERS PLC AND ANY SUBSIDIARY COMPANY (WITHIN THE MEANING OF SECTION 736 OF THE COMPANIES ACT 1985) ("EMPLOYEES") AND WHETHER SINGLY OR COLLECTIVELY ANY WIFE HUSBAND WIDOW WIDOWER CHILD OR ANY OTHER PERSON WHO IS OR HAS AT ANY TIME BEEN EITHER WHOLLY OR IN PART DEPENDENT UPON ANY OF THE EMPLOYEES. IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO DISPENSE RELIEF IN SUCH MANNER AS IN THEIR ABSOLUTE AND UNFETTERED DISCRETION THEY MAY THINK FIT INCLUDING (BY WAY OF EXAMPLE AND WITHOUT IN ANY WAY LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF SUCH POWER). (A) MAKING GRANTS IN MONEY INVESTMENTS OR IN KIND TO ASSIST IN MEETING OUTGOINGS SUCH AS FOR THE SUPPLY OF GAS, WATER AND ELECTRICITY (B) GRANTING OR PURCHASING PENSIONS (C) MAKING LOANS (D) DONATING TO OTHER CHARITIES OFFERING RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION SUCH AS ALMSHOUSES, HOMES OR HOSTELS (E) PROVIDING OR ADAPTING RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION AND PAYING FOR THE COST OF ESSENTIAL REPAIRS AND REDECORATION (F) PAYING FEES FOR ADVICE OR SERVICES (G) DISCHARGING DEBTS (H) PAYING FUNERAL EXPENSES (I) PROVIDING SICKNESS BENEFITS (J) PAYING FOR MEDICAL CONSULTATIONS AND TREATMENT, DRUGS, MEDICAL AND SURGICAL APPLIANCES, NURSING AND RELATED TRAVELLING EXPENSES (K) PROVIDING CLOTHING, FOOD, FURNITURE AND APPLIANCES (L) PROVIDING ASSISTANCE TOWARDS MEETING THE COST OF CONVALESCENCE OR REHABILITATION OF ANY KIND.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN GI
Contact information
- Address:
-
Schroder Investment Management Ltd
1 London Wall Place
LONDON
EC2Y 5AU
- Phone:
- 02076582778
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window