SCARBOROUGH ISLAMIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN SCARBOROUGH BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PRAYER AND RELIGIOUS SERVICES, PROVIDING ISLAMIC EDUCATION, PROVIDING OTHER SUCH SERVICES TO THE ISLAMIC COMMUNITY AS NEEDED. THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY IN SCARBOROUGH BY PROMOTING AND ENGAGING IN DIALOGUE BETWEEN THOSE OF ISLAMIC FAITH AND OTHER RELIGIONS AND ALSO DIALOGUE WITH THE COMMUNITY AT LARGE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 28 January 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABUL ALI | Chair | 13 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Candice Faqir | Trustee | 03 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Juber Ahmed | Trustee | 03 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Masum Ahmed | Trustee | 03 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Iftekhar | Trustee | 03 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aisha Hamouda | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shahid Faqir | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALKAS ALI | Trustee | 13 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
FAIZUL HAQ | Trustee | 13 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
ASRAR YASIN | Trustee | 11 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr MAZEN QUNIBI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ABDELRHMAN LAZIM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.18k | £21.54k | £26.57k | £43.78k | £42.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.09k | £22.08k | £24.42k | £43.85k | £29.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 April 2022 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 April 2022 | 452 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 April 2022 | 452 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 MAY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 11 OCTOBER 2002.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SCARBOROUGH, RYEDALE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") IN PARTICULAR THOSE OF ISLAMIC RELIGION, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF HEALTH FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION AMONGST MUSLIMS LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY PROVIDING THEM WITH FACILITIES FOR RELIGIOUS OBSERVANCE, AS PRESCRIBED BY ISLAM. ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
SCARBOROUGH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Scarborough Islamic Centre
62 Roscoe Street
SCARBOROUGH
North Yorkshire
YO12 7BY
- Phone:
- 01723448356
- Email:
- info@scarbislam.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window