GRACE FOUNTAIN CHURCH LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian Religion at Home and Abroad by proclaiming truths concerning God's Son Jesus Christ as taught in the Holy Bible. Such other charitable purposes as shall further the attainment of the above including supporting missionary activities in the UK and overseas. Promotion of religious instruction in accordance with the Christian religion by means of a Sunday School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wigan
Governance
- 22 November 2002: Standard registration
- GREENOUGH CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RT REV FOSTER HOLY DOE | Chair |
|
||||||
GWENETH RYDER | Trustee | 30 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN WATSON JP | Trustee | 18 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.83k | £74.69k | £68.80k | £90.25k | £102.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.56k | £63.29k | £61.11k | £77.35k | £97.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/05/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/09/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/03/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20/11/2014
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST AND LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE WORD OF GOD BY THE CHURCH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FUNDAMENTAL TRUTHS; IN THE VIRGIN BIRTH OF OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST AND IN HIS SINLESS LIFE ON EARTH, IN THE TRUINE GOD, FATHER, SON AND HOLY SPIRIT, IN REDEMPTION THROUGH THE SHED BLOOD OF CHRIST ON CALVARY, IN THE RESURRECTION OF CHRIST AND HIS SECOND COMING, IN THE WATER BAPTISM OF BELIEVERS BY TOTAL IMMERSION, IN THE FULLNESS OF THE HOLY SPIRIT AS IN ACTS 2.4 WITH THE INITIAL EVIDENCE OF SPEAKING TONGUES, IN THE MINISTRY OF THE MIRACULOUS, THAT CHRISTIANS MUST LIVE CLEAN, SEPARATED LIVES, THAT THE BIBLE IS GOD'S INSPIRED WORD FROM GENESIS TO REVELATION. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL FURTHER THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY INCLUDING SUPPORTING MISSIONARY ACTIVITIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS. PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY MEANS OF A SUNDAY SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM & OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Grace Fountain Church
Scholes
WIGAN
WN1 3NH
- Phone:
- 01942496755
- Email:
- gfc.wigan@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window